Governance THE SOLDIERS, SAILORS, AIRMEN AND FAMILIES ASSOCIATION - FORCES HELP
Charity number: 210760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 28 April 1965: Standard registration
- 30 April 2021: Funds received from 262397 LORD CRAVEN'S CHARITY
- 02 June 2023: Funds received from 701338 THE NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE HOSPITALS CHILDRENS TRUST
- 29 November 2023: Funds received from 1146942 HULL REMEMBERS
- 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- S S A F A FORCES HELP (Working name)
- SSAFA (Working name)
- ssafa, the armed forces charity (Working name)
- SOLDIERS', SAILORS' AND AIRMEN'S FAMILIES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.