Financial history THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 211014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.45m £61.78m £68.71m £65.63m £52.53m
Total expenditure £57.17m £61.46m £65.38m £67.26m £61.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £41.00k £1.41m
Income - Donations and legacies £427.00k £1.33m £482.00k £534.00k £450.00k
Income - Other trading activities £8.26m £11.50m £11.28m £11.44m £3.74m
Income - Charitable activities £44.96m £44.60m £52.15m £48.26m £45.60m
Income - Endowments £0 £612.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.36m £1.75m £1.97m £2.43m £2.74m
Income - Other £2.44m £2.60m £2.84m £2.97m £13.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £53.33m £56.42m £60.19m £61.17m £59.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.84m £5.04m £5.18m £6.10m £2.23m
Expenditure - Governance £458.00k £402.00k £357.00k £416.00k £329.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £440.00k £338.00k £357.00k £314.00k £345.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £380.00k £478.00k £394.00k £595.00k £610.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0