BELCHAMP ST PAUL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HOUSE

Charity number: 211460
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required