Financial history ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 212808
Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £83.24m £30.06m £26.71m £26.92m £28.08m
Total expenditure £34.27m £30.70m £28.96m £29.57m £34.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.14m £5.36m £4.82m £4.94m £5.31m
Income - Other trading activities £418.00k £288.00k £311.00k £199.00k £363.00k
Income - Charitable activities £22.52m £21.74m £19.63m £21.18m £21.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £6.00k £475.00k
Income - Investment £2.34m £2.68m £1.95m £601.00k £692.00k
Income - Other £51.82m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £832.00k £268.00k £734.00k £301.00k £838.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £33.29m £26.51m £25.49m £24.61m £26.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £982.00k £713.00k £691.00k £928.00k £1.02m
Expenditure - Governance £464.00k £522.00k £564.00k £531.00k £752.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £274.00k £332.00k £290.00k £391.00k £433.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.48m £2.79m £4.03m £6.56m