Trustees ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 212808
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Davis Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Professor Peter J Friend Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Professor Vivien C Lees Trustee 08 July 2021
None on record
Lasantha Wijesinghe Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record
ROBERT GREIG Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
TIMOTHY EDWARD MITCHELL Trustee 09 July 2020
THE SIR RATANJI DALAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Overdue by 18 days
MATTHEW JAMES GARRETT Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
TIMOTHY EDWARD ELLIOT GOODACRE Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
PANKAJ DAVE Trustee 16 August 2019
None on record
FIONA MYINT FRCS Trustee 13 July 2017
None on record
SIR AMYAS MORSE Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR NEIL JAMES MCCREADY MORTENSEN FRCS Trustee 14 July 2016
None on record