THE RED POLL CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 213132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £39.51k £45.24k £47.75k £52.17k £43.78k
Total expenditure £35.05k £39.35k £45.36k £46.40k £52.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A