THE NEWBURY CHURCH AND ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 213803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tania Wolak Trustee 03 June 2019 None on record
Robert Kennaugh Trustee 27 March 2020 None on record
Darren King Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Jo Fageant Trustee 04 November 2019 None on record
Ian Park Trustee 01 April 2012 None on record
Rev Trevor Maines Canon Trustee 03 August 2018 None on record
Richard Coward Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Rev Will Hunter-Smart Chair 01 October 2011 None on record
Colin Price Trustee 25 June 2018 None on record