Accounts and annual returns THE RODDAM CHARITY

Charity number: 213892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required