Trustees THE RODDAM CHARITY

Charity number: 213892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IRENE EVANS Chair
None on record
Anne Stevens Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Rev Merry Smith Trustee 12 September 2018
TOWN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
PETER STERLING Trustee 07 March 2017
None on record
Gordon Bell Trustee 03 September 2014
None on record
Sally Wiggin Trustee 11 October 2013
NEWPORT SHROPSHIRE (COSY HALL) VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
BARRY PIERCE MBE Trustee
None on record
MRS S ASKIN Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER EMERY Trustee
None on record