Financial history THE RODDAM CHARITY

Charity number: 213892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.56k £4.59k £4.72k £3.84k £17.22k
Total expenditure £3.89k £4.45k £4.53k £2.54k £7.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A