Trustees ATCHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 215995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT FRANCIS THURSTON | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE VASILIKI WILDBLOOD | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Daley | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ROSEMARIE STOCKING | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EDNA ROTHWELL | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RUSTON | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROSALINDE HELEN WESTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN WESTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.