THE BISHOP HICKMAN CHARITY AND OTHERS

Charity number: 216023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required