THE BISHOP HICKMAN CHARITY AND OTHERS

Charity number: 216023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sue Turner Trustee 31 May 2013 None on record
Rev Charles Higgins Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Chris Catlin Chair 19 November 2007 None on record
Anne Patricia McCreath Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
JANE BENNETT Trustee 16 April 2010 None on record