THE BISHOP HICKMAN CHARITY AND OTHERS

Charity number: 216023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.08k £1.89k £1.90k £1.85k £1.76k
Total expenditure £1.30k £250 £0 £544 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A