Trustees ST JUST-IN-PENWITH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 216189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Marriott Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Marian Woolfall Trustee 11 March 2020
None on record
Glenda Hind Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
Liz Giddens Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
HILARY WILLIAMS Trustee 05 May 2013
None on record
JENNY LEGGO Trustee 21 May 2012
None on record
ANGELA RAWLINSON Trustee 07 May 2012
None on record
JENNY TREVAINS Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE JANE MERCER Trustee
None on record
JEFFREY THOMAS Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY FRANK HOLMAN Trustee
None on record
TONY BOYNS Trustee
None on record