BLIND VETERANS UK

Charity number: 216227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On time Download