BLIND VETERANS UK

Charity number: 216227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Williamson Trustee 03 February 2017 None on record
Barry Coupe Trustee 28 March 2016 None on record
DAVID TURNER Trustee 01 February 2016 None on record
Alan Holderness Trustee 11 December 2018
BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT BLIND SOCIETY Received: On time
Nicola Pulford Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Ian Sherriff Trustee 23 June 2020 None on record
AIR VICE MARSHALL PAUL LUKER CB OBE Chair 08 January 2013 None on record
Sarah-Lucie Watson Trustee 02 December 2014 None on record
Neelesh Heredia Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Lieutenant General M W Poffley OBE Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
Christopher Cardwell Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
Tim Seal Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
MALCOLM CREE Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
GUY DAVIES Trustee 20 March 2018 None on record