BLIND VETERANS UK

Charity number: 216227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £28.61m £29.76m £25.34m £28.13m £27.53m
Total expenditure £36.22m £36.14m £38.26m £42.21m £33.06m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £203.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £20.69m £21.48m £17.50m £17.25m £20.22m
Income - Other trading activities £78.00k £28.00k £19.00k £8.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.65m £2.50m £2.57m £2.50m £1.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.81m £3.83m £3.84m £3.53m £2.85m
Income - Other £1.39m £1.92m £1.41m £4.84m £2.91m
Income - Legacies £13.52m £14.53m £10.76m £10.91m £11.43m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.01m £29.96m £31.42m £31.35m £26.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.21m £6.18m £6.84m £7.81m £6.70m
Expenditure - Governance £156.00k £208.00k £217.00k £0 £64.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.07m £997.00k £936.00k £917.00k £900.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.05m £0