Governance THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CHILDREN

Charity number: 216401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 01 April 1963: Standard registration
  • 06 August 2018: Funds received from 252451 THE BIRD CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 01 October 2018: Funds received from 256640 NEW RENASCENCE
  • 31 October 2018: Funds received from 1121107 LIVERPOOL PROPERTY AID LIMITED
  • 11 February 2019: Funds received from 1024260 WINCHESTER CHILDMINDING GROUP
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 17 December 2020: Funds received from 253002 MISS M L WATTS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT OTHERWISE KNO...
  • 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
  • 07 June 2022: Funds received from 1175428 GIFT A CHANCE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NSPCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property