THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 217497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 January 2019 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 December 2017 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required