Trustees REES JEFFREYS ROAD FUND
Charity number: 217771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. Joanne Kate Freeman | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gregory Richard Marsden | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzanne Green | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Graham BSc FCIHT | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Chipping | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gooding CB | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Glenn Lyons PhD MCIHT | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Regina Florence Clarke CBE | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.