BAPTIST BUILDING FUND

Charity number: 218823
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £608.01k £577.92k £488.41k £572.84k £200.98k
Total expenditure £157.65k £444.85k £340.90k £75.59k £23.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £41.15k £25.18k N/A £14.63k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £2.84k £1.79k N/A £779 N/A
Income - Other £564.02k £550.95k N/A £557.43k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £150.57k £444.85k N/A £75.59k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.09k £10.09k N/A £9.62k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £131.05k £413.52k N/A £52.57k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A