THE OAKDALE TRUST

Charity number: 218827
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)