Trustees THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST AND OF ST ANNE IN OKEHAM
Charity number: 218931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PATTINSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Mark Reihill | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Gilbert | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Leonard Johnson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon John Aley | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Helen Greenwood | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Taylor | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Richard Cook | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
JILL MAYHEW | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Whittington | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Val harvey | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Griffiths | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
The Very Revd Christopher Charles Dalliston | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev'd Dr Pippa Madgwick | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SMITH | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Reverend Canon RACHEL WATTS | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLARE JOHNSON | Trustee | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.