THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 218951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.91m £1.85m £1.58m £2.08m £1.45m
Total expenditure £1.98m £2.01m £2.07m £2.49m £1.36m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £277.39k £246.26k £209.03k £438.74k £314.67k
Income - Other trading activities £1.63m £1.60m £1.37m £0 £1.12m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.64m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £2.14k £4.70k £9.90k
Income - Other £6.29k £5.34k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £154.43k £150.99k £114.97k £0 £221.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £73.91k £1.97m £2.41m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.93m £99.33k £70.77k £42.64k
Expenditure - Governance £44.65k £73.91k £73.91k £0 £28.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0