THE INCORPORATED CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY

Charity number: 218951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Jennifer Gillian Nash Trustee 27 June 2016 None on record
Rev David John Elliott Fr Trustee 21 January 2020 None on record
LUKE PARSONS QC Trustee 26 September 2006 None on record
Dr William Peter O'Neil Trustee 27 June 2016 None on record
CARRIE ANN GATES Trustee 21 September 2015 None on record
Rev ANDREW CHARLES PINSENT Trustee 27 March 2017 None on record
The Right Reverend Paul Hendricks Chair 22 September 2003
THE BLUNDELL CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
SOUTHWARK TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
DE SAMPAYO BEQUEST Received: On time
WHITTINGHAM BEQUEST Received: On time
WILLIAMS SOUTHWARK FUND Received: On time
WEDGEWOOD ENDOWMENT ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Received: On time
DUKE OF NORFOLK TRUST Received: On time
ROBINSON BEQUEST Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND Received: On time
THE ALLENBY ENDOWMENT IN CONNECTION WITH CRAYFORD R C SCHOOL Received: On time
DUFFY BEQUEST Received: On time
CANON TIERNEY TRUST Received: On time
HONORA TURNER O'CALLAGHAN SCHOLARSHIP FUND Received: On time
CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON Received: On time
THE CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION Received: On time
WOODROFFE BEQUEST ADMINISTERED BY (THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK) Received: On time
BUTLER TRUST Received: On time
HOWARD OF GLOSSOP BEQUEST Received: On time
REDMOND'S CHARITY Received: On time
DEPTFORD POOR FUND Received: On time
MRS C J I B GORDON-CANNING'S PRIESTS' TRUST (LONDON) Received: On time