SIM INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 219763
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.28m £4.20m £4.18m £4.14m £4.35m
Total expenditure £3.50m £4.30m £4.50m £4.45m £4.29m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.15m £4.11m £4.08m £111.55k £4.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £3.95m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £53.94k £51.07k £50.37k £53.94k £46.64k
Income - Other £78.33k £44.68k £49.38k £23.51k £6.57k
Income - Legacies £93.93k £164.01k £117.10k £111.55k £166.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.38m £4.16m £3.27m £3.79m £4.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £122.72k £141.55k £172.13k £94.65k £153.75k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.79k £0 £25.40k £20.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.05m £561.71k £0