SIM INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 219763
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YOSEPH MENGISTU WOLDEGEBREAL Trustee 08 February 2018
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (SAGM) Received: On time
Bennett CHANDRAN CHANDRASEKAR Trustee 26 May 2020 None on record
Stephen Paul Smith Trustee 28 March 2014
LIVING WORD INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (SAGM) Received: On time
David Brian Thompson Trustee 26 May 2020 None on record
Nigel Robert John Younge Trustee 24 April 2015
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
Dr Carolyn Susan Reid Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
CLAIRE NEWMAN Trustee 08 February 2018
MRS R P TINDALL'S CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Jonny Dyer Trustee 24 April 2015
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (SAGM) Received: On time
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
MR MARK HEASMAN Trustee 24 April 2015
SCRIPTURE UNION INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL Received: On time
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (SAGM) Received: On time
HAVEN CHURCH Received: On time
AFRICA EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL Received: On time