KINGSTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 219819
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRENDA MARIAN NELLER Trustee None on record
Keith Hicks Trustee 16 February 2014 None on record
Vivienne Bewick Trustee 07 April 2013 None on record
Jenny Elliot Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
Barry Lambert Trustee 09 April 2010 None on record
Penny Crawley Trustee 17 October 2016 None on record
CHRISTINE MOULDER Trustee 31 January 2016 None on record