Governance MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH)

Charity number: 219830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 20 December 1962: Standard registration
  • 12 September 2014: Funds received from 1089430 BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND LAW
  • 13 January 2016: Funds received from 1128427 WEALDEN EASTBOURNE AND LEWES MIND
  • 26 May 2017: Funds received from 1096741 DEPRESSION ALLIANCE
  • 23 October 2020: Funds received from 1148569 BRENTWOOD & DISTRICT MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION
  • 18 November 2021: Funds received from 1104522 PARENT CHEERLEADER ASSOCIATION OF THE CARSHALTON C...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MIND (Working name)
  • THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property