MIND (THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH)

Charity number: 219830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Shubulade Smith Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Cynthia Tze Keng Ko Trustee 09 December 2021 None on record
ALYSON SCOTT Trustee 01 January 2018
YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE MIND CONSORTIUM Received: On time
Ian Ruddock Trustee 24 January 2014 None on record
Judith Elizabeth Trenier Trustee 09 December 2021 None on record
Joanne Stella Maria Theodoulou Trustee 01 November 2016
SOCIAL MOBILITY BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP Received: On time
Alexandra Naomi Jensen Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Christer Eric Stoyell Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Emrys Elias Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
Mrs Valerie Harrison Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Stephanie Spring Chair 01 December 2018
THE BRITISH COUNCIL Received: On time
Ms Mandeep Rupra Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
Ms Philippa Glucklich Trustee 01 December 2020 None on record
ANNA HUGHES Trustee 08 February 2017 None on record
Rohan Alvin Kallicharan Trustee 09 December 2021 None on record
Johnathan James Wilderspin Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record