Elm Trees Retirement Living Limited

Charity number: 220392
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £486.16k £414.91k £394.36k £400.05k £418.90k
Total expenditure £520.02k £460.91k £437.71k £471.82k £481.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A