ST NEOT UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 220401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required