Trustees THE BRITISH RED CROSS SOCIETY

Charity number: 220949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Jane Padmore Chair 01 January 2022
GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE DITCHLEY FOUNDATION
Overdue by 82 days
WINCHESTER HOSPICE FUNDRAISING CHARITY
Received: On time
THE STAFF COLLEGE: LEADERSHIP IN HEALTHCARE
Received: On time
Alan House Trustee 01 January 2023
THE FIREFIGHTERS MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Howard Ashley Bell Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Sir John Eaton Holmes Trustee 01 January 2022
THE FRIENDS OF THE FRENCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Kirsty Robeson Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Katie Igras Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Louise Halpin Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Yaseer Ahmed Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Dennis Dunn MBE JP DL Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Lewis Iwu Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Professor Geeta Nargund Trustee 01 January 2018
CREATE HEALTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MILD APPROACHES IN ASSISTED REPRODUCTION
Received: On time
Deborah El-Sayed Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
LIZ HAZELL Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record