SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND OF DEWSBURY BATLEY AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 223298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 May 2018 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 May 2018 118 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 September 2016 On time Download