THE NEW ENGLAND COMPANY

Charity number: 224425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev COLIN GEORGE FOX Trustee None on record
NICK WELLS Chair None on record
BILLY STEPHENSON Trustee 04 July 2012 None on record
DAVID MORRIS FITZGERALD SCOTT Trustee None on record
Rev Christopher Lewis Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
CHARLES JOHN TALBOT Trustee
THE EDENBRIDGE MUSIC AND ARTS TRUST Received: On time
THE MADRIGAL SOCIETY MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
Rev Alice Smith Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
WILLIAM RATHBONE OBE Trustee
NORTH WALTHAM VILLAGE TRUST Received: On time
WILLIAM RATHBONE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE CHILDREN'S REST SCHOOL OF RECOVERY Received: On time
THE HADFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE QUEEN'S NURSING INSTITUTE Received: On time
MISS E F RATHBONE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
RICHARD JULIAN WESTERN MILLIKEN Trustee None on record
WILLIAM MICHAEL FITZGERALD SCOTT Trustee 01 February 2015 None on record
The Right Reverend Peter William Wheatley Trustee
ST LUKE'S HEALTHCARE FOR THE CLERGY Received: On time
COMMUNITY OF ST MARY AT THE CROSS Received: On time
GUYANA DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION Overdue by 393 days
CHRIST CHURCH ST LEONARDS OLD BUILDINGS TRUST Received: On time
The Hon Luke Bridgeman Trustee None on record
Timothy Hugh Stewart Duke Trustee 06 October 1993 None on record
GUY CONGREVE STEPHENSON Trustee None on record
NICHOLAS KAYE Trustee 19 June 2011 None on record
THE RT HON THE LORD RAYLEIGH Trustee
LORD RAYLEIGH'S CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
TERLING VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
WILLIAM LEE Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
Richard Talbot Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record