THE PHILLIPS MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 224430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Avril Bell Trustee 25 November 2015 None on record
CHRISTINE MILES Trustee 01 June 2014 None on record
RUTH REID Trustee 24 February 2016 None on record
FRANK MILES Trustee 01 August 2010
TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH EBENEZER BAPTIST CHAPEL, MAGOR Received: On time
GWEN HESTER Trustee 02 January 2012 None on record
EILEEN WENDY SAMMONS Trustee 01 July 2010 None on record
David Kemp Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
CHRISTOPHER COUGHLIN Chair 12 November 1967 None on record