Accounts and annual returns SAILORS' CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 224505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window