Financial history SAILORS' CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 224505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £656.33k £1.19m £715.03k £956.63k £862.68k
Total expenditure £643.74k £693.84k £870.99k £1.01m £864.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £521.29k £1.02m £519.23k £843.42k £819.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £57.04k £104.72k £117.80k £36.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £78.00k £58.50k £78.00k £77.22k £42.85k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £88.23k £546.11k £93.41k £151.07k £203.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £542.36k £560.09k £726.27k £896.93k £717.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £101.38k £133.74k £144.72k £108.30k £147.08k
Expenditure - Governance £15.06k £14.97k £20.28k £16.27k £15.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.35k £17.90k £16.91k £15.68k £17.27k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0