Trustees SAILORS' CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 224505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lee Evans Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
Samantha Raeburn Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
Mark Thundercliffe Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
Mark MacIntyre Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
Captain Nicholas Dodd Trustee 04 August 2022
None on record
Helen Cooper Trustee 02 June 2020
None on record
David Ian Fuller Trustee 16 January 2020
THE YORKSHIRE CADET TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Campey Trustee 18 May 2017
None on record
Donna Blank Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
JULIE ABRAHAM Trustee 11 December 2012
NORTH FERRIBY VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL BECKETT Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record
CAPTAIN CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WITHERS TOWNE Trustee
WILLIAM PETTENGER CHARITY
Received: On time
PICKERING AND NEWINGTON DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 8 days
HULL UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
HULL TRINITY HOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HULL TRINITY HOUSE FUND
Received: On time
DEBBIE ROSENBERG Trustee
SIGHT SUPPORT HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE
Received: On time