SEAFARERS UK (KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS)

Charity number: 226446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.74m £2.83m £4.14m £3.17m £2.36m
Total expenditure £5.61m £4.58m £5.64m £4.68m £4.24m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.07m £1.49m £2.80m £1.91m £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities £361.00k £362.00k £395.00k £258.00k £185.00k
Income - Charitable activities £25.00k £30.00k £29.00k £29.00k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £8.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.28m £951.00k £911.00k £967.00k £765.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £436.00k £883.00k £1.05m £1.33m £983.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.30m £3.34m £4.40m £3.82m £3.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.24m £1.24m £510.00k £1.20m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £173.00k £170.00k £237.00k £284.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.58m £2.57m £0 £2.46m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £397.00k £406.00k £415.00k £452.00k £418.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £343.00k £0