Financial history THE GENERAL SERVICE BOARD OF ALCOHOLICS ANONYMOUS (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED

Charity number: 226745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.42m £1.52m £1.43m £1.42m £1.32m
Total expenditure £1.43m £1.64m £1.66m £1.32m £1.19m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £6.49k
Income - Donations and legacies £825.54k £85.62m £748.91k £911.61k £827.01k
Income - Other trading activities £563.46k £59.63m £633.02k £438.21k £457.32k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.93k £4.27m £44.49k £42.40k £33.67k
Income - Other £0 £2.50m £0 £30.00k £6.49k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £727.40k £827.26k £938.21k £0 £755.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £720.36k £464.13k £430.30k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £700.71k £808.62k £0 £851.02k £0