THE EDMUND GODSON CHARITY

Charity number: 227463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £12.88k £14.01k £15.25k £15.25k £17.83k
Total expenditure £7.62k £7.16k £10.75k £6.31k £9.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A