THE EDMUND GODSON CHARITY

Charity number: 227463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor David Llewellyn Gardner Trustee 26 July 2018
THE CHARLTON SOCIETY Overdue by 155 days
MERIDIAN LINK (LTD BY GUARANTEE) Received: On time
WILLIAM ROGERS Trustee 10 December 2012 None on record
Elaine Kirkland Padwick Trustee 08 May 2015
TENBURY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS Overdue by 32 days
TENBURY TRANSPORT TRUST Received: On time
BURFORD ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
THE BURFORD TRUST Received: 26 days late
Rev MICHAEL KNEEN Trustee 16 January 2014
LEOMINSTER DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
FREYA VILLIS Chair 22 September 2011 None on record
Andrew Oughton Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record