BEARSTED AND THURNHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 228182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 15 March 2020 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 15 March 2019 14 July 2020 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 July 2020 181 days late Download
Annual return 15 March 2018 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2018 08 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 15 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download