BEARSTED AND THURNHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 228182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Tully Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Valerie Keeler Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Carol Glynn Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
SUSAN DINAH HENDERSON Trustee 04 November 2011 None on record
Carole Moncur Trustee 28 April 2021 None on record
Susan Murray Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Melanie Barr Trustee 27 May 2015 None on record
ANNE WHITE Trustee 04 November 2011 None on record
DIANE MARJORIE PARR Trustee None on record
VERLIE MAY MAYES Trustee 23 July 2013 None on record