THE SOUTH TYNESIDE BLIND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 228573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.50k £1.67k £1.50k £1.65k £2.10k
Total expenditure £2.50k £2.62k £1.15k £834 £638
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A