Trustees THE SOUTH TYNESIDE BLIND WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 228573
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IVAN JOHN LUNN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cllr. Anne Mellanby Hetherington | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bennetts | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Ann Margaret Best | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHIELA CAWKWELL | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|||||
VIVIENNE POWELL | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN ELIZABETH STEAD | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.