Accounts and annual returns PETER LATHOM (INCLUDING THE LATHOM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity number: 228828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window