Accounts and annual returns STRATTON ST MARGARET WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 229896
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 August 2022 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required